OH HB95 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-31)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/18/22 - Appropriations effective 4/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4517.22, 5709.911, and 5747.98 and to enact sections 901.61, 5709.916, and 5747.77 of the Revised Code to temporarily allow income tax credits for beginning farmers who participate in a financial management program and for businesses that sell or rent agricultural land, livestock, facilities, or equipment to beginning farmers, to modify the law governing certain tax increment financing arrangements, to alter the types of vehicles that may be purchased at a motor vehicle show, to permit, for a limited time, the abatement of unpaid taxes, penalties, and interest for certain municipal property, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow income tax credits for beginning farmers / related business

Sponsors

Rep. Susan Manchester [R]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]
Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]
Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]
Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Kevin Miller [R]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]
Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]
Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06 Effective 7/18/22 - Appropriations effective 4/18/2022
2022-04-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2022-04-06SenatePassed - Amended
2022-04-05SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2021-09-08SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-06-28HousePassed
2021-03-16HouseReported: Agriculture and Conservation
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
451722Amended CodeCitation Text
5709911Amended CodeCitation Text
5709916New CodeSee Bill Text
574777New CodeSee Bill Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text
90161New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-95
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb95/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb95/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb95/PH/02/hb95_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb95/RS/03/hb95_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb95/PS/04/hb95_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb95/EN/05/hb95_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15626&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15813&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16076&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16228&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17265&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17290&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18862&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18891&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18871&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18899&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18896&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18942&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19014&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-95

Bill Comments

feedback