OH HB94 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-32)
Status: Passed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Effective 1/18/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.2516 of the Revised Code to designate February as "Teen Dating Violence Awareness Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Teen Dating Violence Awareness Month

Sponsors

Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2017-10-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18 Effective 1/18/18
2017-10-11SenatePassed
2017-09-27SenateReported: Judiciary
2017-05-03SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-04-27SenateIntroduced
2017-04-25HousePassed
2017-03-29HouseReported: State and Local Government
2017-03-07HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback