OH HB93 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-28)
Status: Passed on January 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Effective 4/29/22 - Emergency: Sections 3 and 4 effective January 28, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 111.42, 111.43, 111.45, 111.46, 111.48, 111.99, 149.43, 315.25, 317.13, 317.32, 319.28, 2303.12, and 5301.255 and to enact sections 111.431 and 321.25 of the Revised Code and to repeal Section 4 of S.B. 258 of the 134th General Assembly to make changes to the Address Confidentiality Program administered by the Secretary of State, to make changes to county recorder fees, to modify certain requirements for the 2022 primary election, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise Address Confidentiality Program and recorder fees

Sponsors

Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]
Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26 Effective 4/29/22 - Emergency: Sections 3 and 4 effective January 28, 2022.
2022-01-26HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2022-01-26SenatePassed
2022-01-26SenateReported - Substitute: Local Government and Elections
2021-03-03SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
2021-02-25HousePassed - Amended
2021-02-24HouseReported: Civil Justice
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11142Amended CodeCitation Text
11143Amended CodeCitation Text
111431New CodeSee Bill Text
11145Amended CodeCitation Text
11146Amended CodeCitation Text
11148Amended CodeCitation Text
11199Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
230312Amended CodeCitation Text
31525Amended CodeCitation Text
31713Amended CodeCitation Text
31732Amended CodeCitation Text
31928Amended CodeCitation Text
32125New CodeSee Bill Text
5301255Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-93
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb93/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb93/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb93/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb93/RH/01/hb93_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb93/RS/03/hb93_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb93/PS/04/hb93_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb93/EN/05/hb93_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15649&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15713&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15760&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15775&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15995&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15992&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17713&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18218&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18222&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18219&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18217&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18230&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18389&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-93

Bill Comments

feedback