OH HB93 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-43)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 109.57, 325.19, 3719.08, 4715.30, 4723.28, 4729.01, 4729.071, 4729.29, 4729.51, 4729.54, 4729.541, 4729.55, 4729.75, 4729.77, 4729.78, 4729.79, 4729.80, 4729.81, 4729.82, 4729.83, 4729.99, 4731.052, 4731.22, 4731.283, 4776.02, 4776.04, and 5111.172; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 4729.79 (4729.80), 4729.80 (4729.81), 4729.81 (4729.82), 4729.82 (4729.83), 4729.83 (4729.84), and 4729.84 (4729.85); and to enact new section 4729.79 and sections 109.90, 313.212, 3719.031, 3793.22, 4121.50, 4715.302, 4723.064, 4723.487, 4725.092, 4729.162, 4729.291, 4729.552, 4729.571, 4729.69, 4729.86, 4730.53, 4731.054, 4731.055, 4731.241, 4731.391, 5111.085, 5111.179, and 5111.1710 of the Revised Code to establish and modify laws regarding the prevention of prescription drug abuse, to provide that certain county employees when separating from county service as a result of a transfer of the assets of a county hospital are not entitled to unused vacation leave from the county when the employee accepts employment with the acquiring entity and the entity assumes the unused vacation leave accrued to the employee's credit, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish and modify laws regarding the prevention of prescription drug abuse, to provide that certain county employees when separating from county service as a result of a transfer of the assets of a county hospital are not entitled to unused vacation leave from the county when the employee accepts employment with the acquiring entity and the entity assumes the unused vacation leave accrued to the employee's credit, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Rep. Nan Baker [R]
Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]
Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]
Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]
Rep. Armond Budish [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]
Rep. John Carey [R]Rep. John Carney [D]Sen. Gary Cates [R]Rep. Ted Celeste [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]
Sen. David Daniels [R]Rep. Timothy DeGeeter [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]
Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]Rep. Mike Foley [D]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]
Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]Sen. Karen Gillmor [R]Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]
Rep. Jay Goyal [D]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]
Rep. Robert Hagan [D]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Rep. Tracy Heard [D]
Rep. Michael Henne [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]
Rep. Dale Mallory [D]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]
Rep. Ross McGregor [R]Rep. Todd McKenney [R]Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]
Rep. Dennis Murray [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Jon Peterson [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]
Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Lynn Slaby [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]Sen. Shirley Smith [D]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Sen. Jimmy Stewart [R]
Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Rep. Carlton Weddington [D]Sen. Christopher Widener [R]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2011-05-18 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-20 Effective Date
2011-05-20 Governor' Action
2011-05-31 End of 10-day period
2011-05-18 Sent to Governor
2011-05-18 Concurrence
2011-05-17 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-05-12 Committee Report - S
2011-03-10 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2011-03-10 Introduced to Senate
2011-03-09 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-03-03 Committee Report - S
2011-02-08 To Health & Aging
2011-02-08 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
10957Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
325Amended CodeCitation Text
32519Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3719Amended CodeCitation Text
371908Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4715Amended CodeCitation Text
471530Amended CodeCitation Text
4723Amended CodeCitation Text
472328Amended CodeCitation Text
4723481Amended CodeCitation Text
4729Amended CodeCitation Text
472901Amended CodeCitation Text
4729071Amended CodeCitation Text
472929Amended CodeCitation Text
472951Amended CodeCitation Text
472954Amended CodeCitation Text
4729541Amended CodeCitation Text
472955Amended CodeCitation Text
472975Amended CodeCitation Text
472977Amended CodeCitation Text
472978Amended CodeCitation Text
472979Amended CodeCitation Text
472980Amended CodeCitation Text
472981Amended CodeCitation Text
472982Amended CodeCitation Text
472983Amended CodeCitation Text
472984Amended CodeCitation Text
472999Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
4731052Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text
4731283Amended CodeCitation Text
4776Amended CodeCitation Text
477602Amended CodeCitation Text
477604Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5111Amended CodeCitation Text
5111172Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback