OH HB9 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3333.16 and 3345.81 and to enact sections 3345.351 and 3345.481 of the Revised Code with regard to student degree completion at state institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards student degree completion and general ed requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateIntroduced
2019-06-27HousePassed
2019-06-26HouseReported - Substitute: Higher Education
2019-05-22HouseRefer to Committee: Higher Education
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3333Amended CodeCitation Text
333316Amended CodeCitation Text
3345New CodeSee Bill Text
3345351New CodeSee Bill Text
3345481New CodeSee Bill Text
334581Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback