OH HB89 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5162.01, 5162.36, 5162.361, and 5162.363 and to enact section 5162.366 of the Revised Code to authorize certain Medicaid providers to make referrals for certain services under the Medicaid School Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates Medicaid school program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-08HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2016-12-07SenateManually Generate Message Element
2016-12-07SenatePassed
2016-11-30SenateReported - Substitute: Education
2016-05-17SenateRefer to Committee: Education
2016-05-12SenateIntroduced
2016-05-11HousePassed
2016-01-26HouseReported - Substitute: Health and Aging
2015-03-04HouseRefer to Committee: Health and Aging
2015-02-25HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5162Amended CodeCitation Text
516201Amended CodeCitation Text
516236Amended CodeCitation Text
5162361Amended CodeCitation Text
5162362Amended CodeCitation Text
5162363Amended CodeCitation Text
5162364Amended CodeCitation Text
5162365Amended CodeCitation Text
5162366New CodeSee Bill Text
516254Amended CodeCitation Text
516264Amended CodeCitation Text
52Amended CodeCitation Text
5261Amended CodeCitation Text
5261363Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback