OH HB89 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 73-41)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact section 5.2266 of the Revised Code to designate the second full week of March as Ohio Agriculture Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the second full week of March as Ohio Agriculture Week.

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]
Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]
Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]
Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. Armond Budish [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Rep. James Butler [R]Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]Rep. John Carey [R]Sen. Gary Cates [R]
Rep. Ted Celeste [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]
Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Sen. David Daniels [R]Rep. Timothy DeGeeter [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]
Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]
Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]
Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]Sen. Karen Gillmor [R]Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]
Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]
Rep. Tracy Heard [D]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Shannon Jones [R]
Rep. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Eric Kearney [D]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]
Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]
Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]Rep. Todd McKenney [R]Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]
Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Dennis Murray [D]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Mark Okey [D]Rep. Bill Patmon [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Jon Peterson [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]
Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Lynn Slaby [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]Sen. Shirley Smith [D]
Rep. Todd Snitchler [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]
Sen. Jimmy Stewart [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]
Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Nina Turner [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]
Rep. Carlton Weddington [D]Sen. Christopher Widener [R]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]
Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-10 Effective Date
2011-03-11 Governor' Action
2011-03-16 End of 10-day period
2011-03-04 Sent to Governor
2011-03-02 Concurrence
2011-03-02 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-03-01 Committee Report
2011-02-17 To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources
2011-02-17 Introduced to Senate
2011-02-16 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-02-10 Committee Report
2011-02-08 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2011-02-08 Introduced to House

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback