OH HB85 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-19)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 127.19 and to enact sections 109.47, 120.56, 127.20, 307.451, 307.452, and 307.453 of the Revised Code to allow the Controlling Board to transfer money to the Attorney General and State Public Defender to defray county costs associated with certain capital cases and to declare an emergency.
Title
Transfer money to defray county capital case costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2019-03-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Finance and Appropriations
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Local Government
Finance and Appropriations
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Local Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 09 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 20 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 27 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 27 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
3 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 07 | 451 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 07 | 452 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 07 | 453 | New Code | See Bill Text |