OH HB85 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3313.60 and 3319.073 and to enact sections 3314.031 and 3326.091 of the Revised Code with respect to age-appropriate student instruction in child sexual abuse and sexual violence prevention and in-service staff training in child sexual abuse prevention.
Title
Instruct students and staff in child sex abuse prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported: Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 14 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 26 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |