OH HB83 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2151.231, 3103.03, 3109.53, 3109.66, 3111.01, 3111.04, 3111.06, 3111.07, 3111.111, 3111.15, 3111.29, 3111.38, 3111.381, 3111.48, 3111.49, 3111.78, 3119.01, 3119.06, 3119.07, and 3121.29; to enact sections 3111.041, 3119.95, 3119.951, 3119.953, 3119.955, 3119.957, 3119.9511, 3119.9513, 3119.9515, 3119.9517, 3119.9519, 3119.9523, 3119.9525, 3119.9527, 3119.9529, 3119.9531, 3119.9533, 3119.9535, 3119.9537, 3119.9539, and 3119.9541; and to repeal section 3121.46 of the Revised Code to make changes to child support laws with regard to caretakers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise child support laws with regard to caretakers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-06-25HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseReported - Substitute: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151231Amended CodeCitation Text
310303Amended CodeCitation Text
310953Amended CodeCitation Text
310966Amended CodeCitation Text
311101Amended CodeCitation Text
311104Amended CodeCitation Text
3111041New CodeSee Bill Text
311106Amended CodeCitation Text
311107Amended CodeCitation Text
3111111Amended CodeCitation Text
311115Amended CodeCitation Text
311129Amended CodeCitation Text
311138Amended CodeCitation Text
3111381Amended CodeCitation Text
311148Amended CodeCitation Text
311149Amended CodeCitation Text
311178Amended CodeCitation Text
311901Amended CodeCitation Text
311906Amended CodeCitation Text
311907Amended CodeCitation Text
311995New CodeSee Bill Text
3119951New CodeSee Bill Text
31199511New CodeSee Bill Text
31199513New CodeSee Bill Text
31199515New CodeSee Bill Text
31199517New CodeSee Bill Text
31199519New CodeSee Bill Text
31199523New CodeSee Bill Text
31199525New CodeSee Bill Text
31199527New CodeSee Bill Text
31199529New CodeSee Bill Text
3119953New CodeSee Bill Text
31199531New CodeSee Bill Text
31199533New CodeSee Bill Text
31199535New CodeSee Bill Text
31199537New CodeSee Bill Text
31199539New CodeSee Bill Text
31199541New CodeSee Bill Text
3119955New CodeSee Bill Text
3119957New CodeSee Bill Text
312129Amended CodeCitation Text
312146Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-83
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb83/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb83/RH/01/hb83_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb83/PH/02/hb83_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15680&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15978&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16747&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16777&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17254&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17293&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-83

Bill Comments 750

feedback