OH HB81 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-23)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 503.40, 503.41, 503.42, 503.43, 503.44, 503.47, 503.48, 503.49, 503.50, 715.61, 2927.17, 4731.04, 4731.15, and 4731.41; to enact section 503.411; and to repeal sections 503.45 and 503.46 of the Revised Code to make changes to the laws governing massage establishments and massage therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise laws governing massage establishments / massage therapy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-06-24HousePassed
2021-06-23HouseReported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
292717Amended CodeCitation Text
473104Amended CodeCitation Text
473115Amended CodeCitation Text
473141Amended CodeCitation Text
50340Amended CodeCitation Text
50341Amended CodeCitation Text
503411New CodeSee Bill Text
50342Amended CodeCitation Text
50343Amended CodeCitation Text
50344Amended CodeCitation Text
50345Repealed CodeCitation Text
50346Repealed CodeCitation Text
50347Amended CodeCitation Text
50348Amended CodeCitation Text
50349Amended CodeCitation Text
50350Amended CodeCitation Text
71561Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-81
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb81/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb81/RH/01/hb81_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb81/PH/02/hb81_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15636&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15666&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16578&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17123&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17162&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17178&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17283&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18180&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-81

Bill Comments

feedback