OH HB81 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-32)
Status: Passed on September 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Effective 9/15/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4113.21, 4123.026, 4123.52, 4123.56, 4123.58, 4123.65, and 4123.66 and to enact section 4121.471 of the Revised Code regarding employee medical examinations and changes to the Worker's Compensation Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards post-diagnostics-prison guard exposed to bodily fluids

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Kent Smith [D]
Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]

Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15 Effective 9/15/20
2020-05-28HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-05-20SenatePassed
2020-02-26SenateReported - Amended: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-12-04SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-11-26SenateIntroduced
2019-11-20HousePassed
2019-11-19HouseReported - Substitute: Insurance
2019-03-05HouseRefer to Committee: Insurance
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4113Amended CodeCitation Text
411321Amended CodeCitation Text
4121New CodeSee Bill Text
4121471New CodeSee Bill Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
4123026Amended CodeCitation Text
412352Amended CodeCitation Text
412356Amended CodeCitation Text
412358Amended CodeCitation Text
412365Amended CodeCitation Text
412366Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback