OH HB81 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Re-referred: Rules and Reference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Re-referred: Rules and Reference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2929.02, 2929.022, 2929.024, 2929.03, 2929.04, 2929.06, 2953.21, and 2953.23 and to enact section 2929.025 of the Revised Code to provide that a person convicted of aggravated murder who shows that the person had a serious mental illness at the time of committing the offense cannot be sentenced to death for the offense and to provide a mechanism for resentencing to a life sentence a person previously sentenced to death who proves that the person had a serious mental illness at the time of committing the offense.
Title
Prohibit death sentence if have serious mental illness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2018-12-13 | House | Informally passed |
2018-12-13 | House | Informally passed |
2018-12-12 | House | Informally passed |
2018-12-05 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2017-02-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Prisons
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Prisons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 53 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |