OH HB79 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 3901.87 of the Revised Code to prohibit qualified health plans from providing coverage for certain abortions.
Title
To prohibit qualified health plans from providing coverage for certain abortions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2011-12-21 | Governor' Action | |
2011-12-28 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-12-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-12-14 | Concurrence | |
2011-12-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-12-08 | Committee Report | |
2011-06-30 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2011-06-30 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-06-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Report | |
2011-02-01 | To Health & Aging | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
39 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | 87 | New Code | See Bill Text |