OH HB78 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 67-2)
Status: Passed on October 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2305.11, 2307.52, 2919.16, and 4731.22, to enact new sections 2919.17 and 2919.18, to enact section 2919.171, and to repeal sections 2919.17 and 2919.18 of the Revised Code to revise the criminal laws governing post-viability abortions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the criminal laws governing post-viability abortions.

Sponsors

Rep Denise Driehaus [D]Rep Anne Gonzales [R]Rep Mike Dovilla [R]Rep Andrew Brenner [R]
Rep Richard Adams [R]Rep Peter Stautberg [R]Rep Todd Snitchler [R]Rep Jeffrey McClain [R]
Rep Jarrod Martin [R]Rep Ron Maag [R]Sen Kris Jordan [R]Rep David Hall [R]
Rep Robert Hackett [R]Rep Cheryl Grossman [R]Rep Timothy Derickson [R]Sen Dave Burke [R]
Rep Bill Hayes [R]Rep Michael Henne [R]Rep Margaret Conditt [R]Rep Christina Hagan [R]
Rep Robert Sprague [R]Sen Larry Obhof [R]Rep James Butler [R]Rep Jim Buchy [R]
Rep Ron Young [R]Rep Cliff Rosenberger [R]Rep Terry Johnson [R]Rep Andy Thompson [R]
Rep Lynn Slaby [R]Rep Kristina Roegner [R]Rep Craig Newbold [R]Rep Todd McKenney [R]
Rep Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep Terry Boose [R]Rep Terry Blair [R]Rep Peter Beck [R]
Sen Scott Oelslager [R]Rep Robery Mecklenborg [R]Sen Shannon Jones [R]Rep Matt Huffman [R]
Sen Jay Hottinger [R]Sen Cliff Hite [R]Rep Bruce Goodwin [R]Sen Randall Gardner [R]
Sen David Daniels [R]Rep Courtney Combs [R]Sen Bill Coley [R]Rep Danny Bubp [R]
Rep Louis Blessing [R]Rep William Batchelder [R]Sen Kevin Bacon [R]Sen Thomas Patton [R]
Rep Jon Peterson [R]Sen Troy Balderson [R]Sen Jason Wilson [D]Sen Mark Wagoner [R]
Sen William Seitz [R]Rep Kirk Schuring [R]Rep Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen Tom Niehaus [R]
Rep Timothy Grendell [R]Sen Keith Faber [R]Rep John Carey [R]Rep Ron Amstutz [R]
Sen Christopher Widener [R]Rep Lynn Wachtmann [R]Sen Joseph Uecker [R]Rep Barbara Sears [R]
Rep John Adams [R]

Roll Calls

2011-07-13 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-20 Effective Date
2011-07-20 Governor' Action
2011-08-01 End of 10-day period
2011-07-20 Sent to Governor
2011-07-13 Concurrence
2011-07-13 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-07-13 Committee Report
2011-06-30 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2011-06-30 Introduced to Senate
2011-06-28 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-03-17 Committee Report
2011-02-01 To *Rules & Reference
2011-02-01 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2305Amended CodeCitation Text
230511Amended CodeCitation Text
2307Amended CodeCitation Text
230752Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2919Amended CodeCitation Text
291916Amended CodeCitation Text
291917Repealed CodeCitation Text
2919171New CodeSee Bill Text
291918Repealed CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback