OH HB77 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-13)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 3345.82 of the Revised Code to allow the board of trustees of a state institution of higher education to adopt a policy allowing the trustees to attend a board meeting via means of electronic communication.
Title
Permit higher ed board of trustees attend electronically
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported: Higher Education and Career Readiness |
2021-02-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Higher Education and Career Readiness |
2021-02-09 | House | Introduced |