OH HB76 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-18 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-18 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4501.21 and to enact sections 4503.436 and 4503.566 of the Revised Code to create the "Ohio National Guard Ohio Cross" license plate and the "Ottawa National Wildlife Refuge" license plate.
Title
Create Ohio Cross and Ottawa Wildlife Refuge license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-18 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-11 | House | Passed |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-02-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 03 | 436 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 03 | 566 | New Code | See Bill Text |