OH HB74 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-02 - Committee Report - S
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-02 - Committee Report - S
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2903.13, 2903.211, 2913.02, and 2917.21 of the Revised Code to expand the offenses of menacing by stalking and telecommunications harassment, to prohibit a person from knowingly causing another person to believe that the offender will cause physical harm or mental distress to a family or household member of the other person, to increase the penalty for assault when the victim is a volunteer firefighter, and to correct a cross reference in the theft statute to special purchase articles.
Title
To expand the offenses of menacing by stalking and telecommunications harassment, to prohibit a person from knowingly causing another person to believe that the offender will cause physical harm or mental distress to a family or household member of the other person, to increase the penalty for assault when the victim is a volunteer firefighter, and to correct a cross reference in the theft statute to special purchase articles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-02 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-12-05 | To Criminal Justice | |
2013-12-05 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-20 | To Judiciary | |
2013-02-20 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 03 | 211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 13 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 17 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |