OH HB705 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3313.25, 3313.31, and 3319.36 of the Revised Code regarding the circumstances in which school district and educational service center treasurers may be held liable for a loss of public funds.
Title
Regards when school treasurer liable for loss of public funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed |
2018-12-05 | House | Reported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2018-06-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2018-06-13 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |