OH HB68 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4113.61 of the Revised Code to require owners of private construction projects to timely pay a contractor.
Title
Require private construction project owner to timely pay
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported: Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 13 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |