OH HB679 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3902.30, 4715.01, 4715.09, 4723.94, 4732.33, and 5164.95; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 4731.2910 (4743.09); and to enact sections 3701.1310, 3721.60, 4715.44, 4730.60, 4753.20, 4755.90, 4757.50, 4758.80, 4759.20, and 5119.368 of the Revised Code to establish and modify requirements regarding the provision of telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish/modify requirements for telehealth services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-06-12SenateIntroduced
2020-06-10HousePassed - Amended
2020-06-09HouseReported - Substitute: Insurance
2020-05-27HouseRefer to Committee: Insurance
2020-05-26HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37011310New CodeSee Bill Text
372160New CodeSee Bill Text
390230Amended CodeCitation Text
471501Amended CodeCitation Text
471509Amended CodeCitation Text
471544New CodeSee Bill Text
472394Amended CodeCitation Text
473060New CodeSee Bill Text
47312910Amended CodeCitation Text
473233Amended CodeCitation Text
475320New CodeSee Bill Text
475590New CodeSee Bill Text
475750New CodeSee Bill Text
475880New CodeSee Bill Text
475920New CodeSee Bill Text
5119368New CodeSee Bill Text
516495Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback