OH HB669 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-13)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Effective 10/13/20 - Emergency: effective 10/13/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 4301.62 and to enact section 4303.185 of the Revised Code to enact provisions of law relative to the sale and delivery of alcoholic beverages by liquor permit holders and to the expansion of sales areas of liquor permit holders and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the definition of premises and sales for liquor permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13 Effective 10/13/20 - Emergency: effective 10/13/2020
2020-09-23HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-09-23SenatePassed
2020-09-23SenateReported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-06-30SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-06-12SenateIntroduced
2020-06-10HousePassed
2020-06-10HouseReported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor
2020-05-27HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2020-05-20HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430162Amended CodeCitation Text
4303185New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback