OH HB663 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 120.33, 149.43, 2317.02, 2941.51, 2945.10, and 2953.21 and to enact sections 2949.221 and 2949.222 of the Revised Code to provide confidentiality and license protection for persons and entities involved in executing a sentence of capital punishment by lethal injection, to provide for a schedule of fees to be paid to appointed counsel in a capital case as set by the Supreme Court, to provide that the attorney client privilege does not apply if the case is a capital case and the client subsequently claims ineffective assistance of counsel regarding the case, to provide for written jury instructions in capital cases, to provide for a joint legislative study committee to study the manner in which families of homicide victims can best be supported, to extend to 365 days the time for filing a postconviction relief petition, and to amend the version of section 149.43 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect on March 20, 2015, to continue the provisions of this act on and after that date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

That is scheduled to take effect on March 20, 2015, to continue the provisions of this act on and after that date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-19 Governor' Action
2014-12-17 Concurrence
2014-12-11 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2014-12-11 Committee Report - S
2014-11-25 To Criminal Justice
2014-11-25 Introduced to Senate
2014-11-20 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2014-11-20 Committee Report - A
2014-11-10 To Policy and Legislative Oversight
2014-11-10 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
120Amended CodeCitation Text
12033Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2317Amended CodeCitation Text
231702Amended CodeCitation Text
29New CodeSee Bill Text
2941Amended CodeCitation Text
294151Amended CodeCitation Text
2945Amended CodeCitation Text
294510Amended CodeCitation Text
2949New CodeSee Bill Text
2949221New CodeSee Bill Text
2949222New CodeSee Bill Text
2949223New CodeSee Bill Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295321Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback