OH HB66 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 107.03, 5703.48, and 5703.95 of the Revised Code to require the reporting of information on and legislative review of property tax exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require reporting/review of property tax exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-03-09SenateIntroduced
2021-03-03HousePassed
2021-02-24HouseReported: Ways and Means
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10703Amended CodeCitation Text
570348Amended CodeCitation Text
570395Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-66
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb66/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb66/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb66/PH/02?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15547&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15645&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15766&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15779&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15870&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-66

Bill Comments

feedback