OH HB62 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Effective 7/3/19 - Appropriations for current expenses effective 04/03/19, but first apply 07/01/19; Appropriations not for current expenses effective 07/03/19; other provisions effective 04/03/19 and 07/01/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 9.54, 107.03, 119.14, 122.14,164.08, 306.70, 307.86,340.021, 505.267, 505.71,1349.61, 1901.18, 1901.20, 1907.02, 1907.031,3327.07,4111.03, 4111.14, 4121.01, 4123.01,4141.01, 4301.62, 4501.01, 4501.031, 4501.042,4501.043, 4503.038, 4503.10, 4503.103, 4503.19,4503.21, 4503.23, 4503.41, 4504.10, 4504.201,4505.101, 4506.09, 4506.11, 4506.17, 4507.01,4507.13, 4507.23, 4507.50, 4507.52, 4509.101,4510.04, 4511.092, 4511.093, 4511.096, 4511.097,4511.098, 4511.0910, 4511.21, 4511.521, 4511.54,4511.76, 4513.263, 4513.34, 4513.60, 4513.601,4513.61, 4513.62, 4513.63, 4513.64, 4513.65,4513.66, 4513.69, 4549.10, 4582.12, 4582.31,5501.21, 5501.41, 5577.044, 5577.15, 5735.01,5735.011, 5735.05, 5735.051, 5735.053, 5735.142,5735.27, 5739.02, 5739.023, 5741.022, 5747.51, 5747.53, and 5747.71; to enact new sections 4511.099 and 5747.502 and sections 3.112, 306.051, 306.353, 4503.193, 4504.173, 4504.181, 4507.18, 5501.09, 5517.07, and 5735.50; and to repeal sections 9.57, 4511.099, 4511.0915, and 5747.502 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 213.20, 223.10, and 223.50 of H.B. 529 of the 132nd General Assembly, as subsequently amended, and to repeal Section 3 of Am. Sub. S.B. 20 of the 120th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to increase the rate of and modify the distribution of revenue from motor fuel excise taxes, to make appropriations for programs related to transportation and public safety for the biennium beginning July 1, 2019, and ending June 30, 2021, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of those programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates FY 2020-2021 transportation budget

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Failed (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03 Effective 7/3/19 - Appropriations for current expenses effective 04/03/19, but first apply 07/01/19; Appropriations not for current expenses effective 07/03/19; other provisions effective 04/03/19 and 07/01/20
2019-04-02SenateConference report agreed to
2019-04-02HouseConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on H.B. 62
2019-03-27SenateConference managers: Sens. - Peterson, Dolan, Antonio: Conference Committee on H.B. 62
2019-03-27HouseConference managers: Reps. - Oelslager, Greenspan, Cera: Conference Committee on H.B. 62
2019-03-27SenateInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2019-03-27HouseRefused to concur in Senate amendments
2019-03-21SenatePassed - Amended
2019-03-21SenateReported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-03-12SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced
2019-03-07HousePassed - Amended
2019-03-07HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
107Amended CodeCitation Text
10703Amended CodeCitation Text
119Amended CodeCitation Text
11914Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12214Amended CodeCitation Text
19Amended CodeCitation Text
1901Amended CodeCitation Text
190118Amended CodeCitation Text
190120Amended CodeCitation Text
1907Amended CodeCitation Text
190702Amended CodeCitation Text
1907031Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
306Amended CodeCitation Text
30670Amended CodeCitation Text
307Amended CodeCitation Text
30786Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4111Amended CodeCitation Text
411114Amended CodeCitation Text
4121Amended CodeCitation Text
412101Amended CodeCitation Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
412301Amended CodeCitation Text
43Amended CodeCitation Text
4301Amended CodeCitation Text
430162Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4501Amended CodeCitation Text
450101Amended CodeCitation Text
4501031Amended CodeCitation Text
4501042Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
4503038Amended CodeCitation Text
450310Amended CodeCitation Text
4503103Amended CodeCitation Text
450319Amended CodeCitation Text
450323Amended CodeCitation Text
450341Amended CodeCitation Text
4504Amended CodeCitation Text
450410Amended CodeCitation Text
4504201Amended CodeCitation Text
4506Amended CodeCitation Text
450609Amended CodeCitation Text
450611Amended CodeCitation Text
450617Amended CodeCitation Text
4507Amended CodeCitation Text
450701Amended CodeCitation Text
450723Amended CodeCitation Text
450750Amended CodeCitation Text
450752Amended CodeCitation Text
4509Amended CodeCitation Text
4509101Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
45110910Amended CodeCitation Text
45110915Repealed CodeCitation Text
4511092Amended CodeCitation Text
4511093Amended CodeCitation Text
4511096Amended CodeCitation Text
4511097Amended CodeCitation Text
4511099Repealed CodeCitation Text
451121Amended CodeCitation Text
4511521Amended CodeCitation Text
451154Amended CodeCitation Text
4513Amended CodeCitation Text
4513263Amended CodeCitation Text
451334Amended CodeCitation Text
451360Amended CodeCitation Text
4513601Amended CodeCitation Text
451362Amended CodeCitation Text
451363Amended CodeCitation Text
451364Amended CodeCitation Text
451365Amended CodeCitation Text
451369Amended CodeCitation Text
4549Amended CodeCitation Text
454910Amended CodeCitation Text
4582Amended CodeCitation Text
458212Amended CodeCitation Text
458231Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
505267Amended CodeCitation Text
50571Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5501Amended CodeCitation Text
550141Amended CodeCitation Text
5577Amended CodeCitation Text
5577044Amended CodeCitation Text
557715Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5735Amended CodeCitation Text
573501Amended CodeCitation Text
573505Amended CodeCitation Text
5735051Amended CodeCitation Text
5735053Amended CodeCitation Text
5735142Amended CodeCitation Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
573902Amended CodeCitation Text
5739023Amended CodeCitation Text
5741Amended CodeCitation Text
5741022Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
5747502Repealed CodeCitation Text
574751Amended CodeCitation Text
574753Amended CodeCitation Text
574771Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-62
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb62/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb62/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb62/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb62/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb62/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb62/CR/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb62/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-62

Bill Comments

feedback