OH HB61 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Reported: Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 149.43 of the Revised Code to include forensic mental health providers, mental health evaluation providers, and regional psychiatric hospital employees as individuals whose residential and familial information is exempt from disclosure under the Public Records Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt certain health provider personal info from public records

Sponsors

Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Nino Vitale [R]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateReported: Judiciary
2019-05-01SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced
2019-03-28HousePassed
2019-03-20HouseReported: Civil Justice
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback