OH HB608 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 3902.62 and 5164.13 of the Revised Code to require health benefit plan and Medicaid program coverage of biomarker testing.
Title
Require health plan and Medicaid coverage of biomarker testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Informally passed |
2022-12-13 | House | Informally passed |
2022-11-30 | House | Reported: Health |
2022-05-31 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Health: Rules and Reference |
2022-05-26 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Insurance |
2022-04-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2022-03-29 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 02 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 64 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |