OH HB60 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Effective 9/13/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Effective 9/13/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 959.131, 959.132, 959.99, 2921.321, 2929.13, 2929.18, and 2931.18 and to enact section 4741.05 of the Revised Code to revise provisions and penalties regarding treatment of companion animals, to revise the definition of "companion animal" in the Offenses Relating to Domestic Animals Law, to provide a state collaborative effort to assist veterinarians in identifying clients who may use their animals to secure opioids for abuse, and to modify the penalty for assaulting a police dog or horse to require, if the dog or horse is killed, a mandatory prison term and a mandatory fine to be paid to the law enforcement agency served by the dog or horse.
Title
Revises animal companion laws
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Patmon [D] | Rep. David Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Effective 9/13/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-25 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-06-25 | House | Passed |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-02-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture : Animals
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 21 | 321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 31 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
47 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 41 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 59 | 131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 59 | 132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 59 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |