OH HB6 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Effective 10/22/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 303.213, 519.213, 713.081, 4906.13, 4928.01, 4928.64, 4928.641, 4928.644, 4928.645, 4928.66, 4928.6610, and 5727.75, to enact sections 3706.40, 3706.41, 3706.43, 3706.431, 3706.45, 3706.46, 3706.49, 3706.53, 3706.55, 3706.59, 3706.61, 3706.63, 3706.65, 4928.148, 4928.47, 4928.471, 4928.642, 4928.75, 4928.80, and 5727.231, and to repeal section 4928.6616 of the Revised Code to facilitate and continue the development, production, and use of electricity from nuclear, coal, and renewable energy resources in this state, to modify the existing mandates for renewable energy and energy efficiency savings, and to determine amounts of federal funding received for home weatherization services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates Ohio Clean Air Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22 Effective 10/22/19
2019-07-23HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2019-07-23HouseAdopted
2019-07-17SenatePassed - Amended
2019-07-17SenateInformally passed
2019-07-17SenateReported - Substitute: Energy and Public Utilities
2019-06-06SenateRefer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities
2019-05-30SenateIntroduced
2019-05-29HousePassed
2019-05-29HouseInformally passed
2019-05-29HouseReported - Substitute: Energy and Natural Resources
2019-05-28HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2019-05-23HouseReported - Substitute: Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy Generation
2019-04-16HouseRefer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1710Amended CodeCitation Text
171006Amended CodeCitation Text
1710061Repealed CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
303Amended CodeCitation Text
303213Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3706Amended CodeCitation Text
370602Amended CodeCitation Text
370603Amended CodeCitation Text
370640New CodeSee Bill Text
370641New CodeSee Bill Text
370642New CodeSee Bill Text
370643New CodeSee Bill Text
3706431New CodeSee Bill Text
370644New CodeSee Bill Text
370645New CodeSee Bill Text
370646New CodeSee Bill Text
370647New CodeSee Bill Text
3706471New CodeSee Bill Text
370648New CodeSee Bill Text
3706481New CodeSee Bill Text
3706482New CodeSee Bill Text
370649New CodeSee Bill Text
370650New CodeSee Bill Text
370653New CodeSee Bill Text
370655New CodeSee Bill Text
370659New CodeSee Bill Text
370661New CodeSee Bill Text
370663New CodeSee Bill Text
370665New CodeSee Bill Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4906Amended CodeCitation Text
490610Amended CodeCitation Text
490613Amended CodeCitation Text
490620Amended CodeCitation Text
4906201Amended CodeCitation Text
4928Amended CodeCitation Text
492801Amended CodeCitation Text
492802Amended CodeCitation Text
4928142Amended CodeCitation Text
4928143Amended CodeCitation Text
4928148New CodeSee Bill Text
492820Amended CodeCitation Text
492846New CodeSee Bill Text
492847New CodeSee Bill Text
4928471New CodeSee Bill Text
492861Amended CodeCitation Text
492862Amended CodeCitation Text
492864Repealed CodeCitation Text
4928641Amended CodeCitation Text
4928642New CodeSee Bill Text
4928643Repealed CodeCitation Text
4928644Amended CodeCitation Text
4928645Amended CodeCitation Text
492865Repealed CodeCitation Text
492866Amended CodeCitation Text
49286610Amended CodeCitation Text
49286616Repealed CodeCitation Text
492875New CodeSee Bill Text
492880New CodeSee Bill Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
519Amended CodeCitation Text
519213Amended CodeCitation Text
519214Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5501Amended CodeCitation Text
5501311Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5727Amended CodeCitation Text
5727231New CodeSee Bill Text
572747Amended CodeCitation Text
572775Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
713Amended CodeCitation Text
713081Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-6
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb6/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb6/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb6/RRH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb6/PH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb6/RH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb6/RS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb6/PS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb6/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-6

Bill Comments

feedback