OH HB59 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-27 - Effective 12/27/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.242 of the Revised Code to designate October 7 as "Moses Fleetwood Walker Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Moses Fleetwood Walker Day

Sponsors

Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]
Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]
Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Martin Sweeney [D]
Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]
Sen. Michael Skindell [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-27 Effective 12/27/17
2017-09-20SenatePassed
2017-06-27SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-03-15SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-03-09SenateIntroduced
2017-03-08HousePassed
2017-03-07HouseReported: State and Local Government
2017-02-21HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-02-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback