OH HB583 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/23/22 - Appropriations effective June 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/23/22 - Appropriations effective June 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.0714, 3307.01, 3309.01, 3310.032, 3310.70, 3313.976, 3314.016, 3314.021, 3314.074, 3317.011, 3317.014, 3317.016, 3317.017, 3317.019, 3317.0110, 3317.02, 3317.024, 3317.0212, 3317.0215, 3317.051, 3317.064, 3317.25, 3319.077, 3319.078, 3323.25, 3323.251, 3326.39, 4723.07, and 5747.057 and to enact sections 5.2318, 3301.136, 3301.28, 3319.263, and 4723.072 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 265.150, 265.210, 265.225, and 265.335 of H.B. 110 of the 134th General Assembly, Section 4 of S.B. 1 of the 134th General Assembly, and Section 5 of H.B. 123 of the 133rd General Assembly as subsequently amended regarding substitute teachers, the school financing system, the Educational Choice Scholarship Program, the Pilot Project Scholarship Program, the ACE Educational Savings Account Program, Community Schools of Quality, community school sponsors, state funding for certain community schools, dyslexia screening requirements, tutoring programs, alternative resident education licenses, Ohio School Safety Month, the career-technical education income tax credit, practical nurse education programs, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Regards educator licenses for substitute teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective 9/23/22 - Appropriations effective June 24, 2022 | |
2022-06-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported: Finance |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported - Substitute - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Primary and Secondary Education |
2022-03-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced |