OH HB58 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3301.0726 of the Revised Code to require the Department of Education to include supplemental instructional materials in cursive handwriting in the English language arts model curriculum.
Title
Require instruction in cursive handwriting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Education |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-20 | House | Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported - Substitute: Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2018-01-23 | House | Re-referred: Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2018-01-16 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2017-06-21 | House | Reported: Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2017-02-21 | House | Refer to Committee: Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 0721 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 01 | 0722 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 01 | 0726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |