OH HB567 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 147.01, 147.011, 147.022, 147.542, 147.55, 147.551, 1901.186, 2303.06, 2303.12, 2303.14, 2303.15, 4505.031, 4505.06, 4505.071, 4519.70, 5739.027, and 5739.029 and to enact sections 2303.081, 2303.901, and 4505.063 of the Revised Code regarding records kept by the clerk of the court of common pleas, court of common pleas court orders made out of court, and common pleas court clerk maintenance of court materials, and to provide immunity to clerks of court who post online a case document with personal identifiers; to provide that documents received, created, or converted by the clerk of court in electronic format are considered the official version of the record; to revise the duties of the board of county commissioners in relation to the clerk of the court of common pleas; to amend the law regarding notaries public; to allow the Tiffin-Fostoria municipal court and the Seneca County court of common pleas to continue to exercise concurrent jurisdiction in operating a drug addiction recovery program indefinitely; and to exempt peace officers from the notary application criminal records check, and to make changes to the notarization requirements for motor vehicle and watercraft certificate of title documents when a licensed motor vehicle dealer is involved in the transfer of title.
Title
Require common pleas court docket to appear on clerk's web site
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-05-18 | House | Passed |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported - Amended: Civil Justice |
2022-02-15 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 542 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 551 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 03 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 03 | 081 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 03 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 03 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 03 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 03 | 901 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 05 | 031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 05 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 05 | 063 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 05 | 071 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 19 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 029 | Amended Code | Citation Text |