OH HB56 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2921.331, 2929.14, 2935.031, 2981.02, 4510.036, and 4511.251 of the Revised Code to require law enforcement entities to train officers related to the pursuit of a motor vehicle and to increase penalties for fleeing from law enforcement and forms of stunt driving.
Title
Increase penalty-fleeing police; regards motor vehicle pursuit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to committee: Judiciary |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-13 | House | Passed |
2023-10-18 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to committee: Criminal Justice |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
House Criminal Justice Committee
Public Safety
Senate Judiciary Committee
Transportation
Transportation : Drivers' Licenses
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
House Criminal Justice Committee
Public Safety
Senate Judiciary Committee
Transportation
Transportation : Drivers' Licenses
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 21 | 331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 35 | 031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 81 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |