OH HB56 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 124.11, 124.34, 329.021, 2953.36, 4121.121, 5120.38, 5120.381, 5120.382, 5123.08, and 5139.02 and to enact sections 9.73 and 5164.44 of the Revised Code to prohibit public employers from including on an employment application any question concerning the criminal background of the applicant, to prohibit a felony conviction from being used against an officer or employee when a public employer is undertaking certain employment practices, unless the conviction occurs while the officer or employee is employed in the civil service, to remove the bar against sealing a conviction record when the victim is 16 or 17 years old, and to provide that certain independent providers are not employees of the state or a political subdivision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits criminal records use in public employment hiring

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23 Effective 3/23/16
2015-12-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2015-12-09SenatePassed
2015-12-09SenateReported - Substitute: State and Local Government
2015-10-07SenateRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2015-10-01SenateIntroduced
2015-09-30HousePassed
2015-06-24HouseReported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor
2015-02-12HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2015-02-10HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
124Amended CodeCitation Text
12411Amended CodeCitation Text
12425Amended CodeCitation Text
12426Amended CodeCitation Text
12434Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295336Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
329Amended CodeCitation Text
329021Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4121Amended CodeCitation Text
4121121Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5120Amended CodeCitation Text
512038Amended CodeCitation Text
5120381Amended CodeCitation Text
5120382Amended CodeCitation Text
5123Amended CodeCitation Text
512308Amended CodeCitation Text
5139Amended CodeCitation Text
513902Amended CodeCitation Text
5164New CodeSee Bill Text
516444New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA131-HB-56
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb56/IN/00/hb56_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb56/RH/01/hb56_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb56/PH/02/hb56_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb56/RS/03/hb56_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb56/PS/04/hb56_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb56/EN/05/hb56_05_EN?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA131-HB-56

Bill Comments

feedback