OH HB558 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-23)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 149.43, 2317.54, 3712.01, 3712.031, 3712.061, 3715.87, 3715.871, 3715.872, 3715.873, 3719.061, 3721.01, 3722.02, 3740.01, 4729.01, 4729.16, 4729.28, 4729.29, 4729.51, 4729.54, 4729.541, 4729.60, 4752.02, and 5123.19; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 4729.44 (3715.502) and 4765.44 (3715.505); to enact sections 5.2532, 5.2533, 3712.032, 3712.042, 3712.063, 3715.50, 3715.501, 3715.503, 3715.504, and 4729.391; and to repeal sections 2925.61, 3707.56, 3707.561, 3707.562, 4723.484, 4723.485, 4723.486, 4729.514, 4729.515, 4730.434, 4730.435, 4730.436, 4731.94, 4731.941, 4731.942, and 4731.943 of the Revised Code to modify the laws governing the drug repository program for donated prescription drugs and the laws governing access to overdose reversal drugs, to authorize a pharmacist to modify a prescription to include a drug delivery device, to register pediatric transition care programs, to designate March as "Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month," and to designate the fourth Wednesday of February as "Hypertrophic Cardiomyopathy Awareness Day."
Title
Regards drug repository program for donated prescription drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2022-02-15 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced |