OH HB558 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-19)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-03 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-03 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 955.011 of the Revised Code to exempt certain disabled veterans from paying a dog registration fee when application is made to the county auditor that includes proof that the dog is an assistance dog.
Title
Exempt veterans assistance dogs from registration fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed |
2018-11-15 | House | Reported: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security |
2018-03-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 55 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |