OH HB554 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4928.143, 4928.64, 4928.643, 4928.645, 4928.65, 4928.66, 4928.662, 4928.6610, and 5727.75 and to enact sections 4928.6620 and 4928.6621 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 6 of Sub. S.B. 310 of the 130th General Assembly and Section 257.80 of Am. Sub. H.B. 64 of the 131st General Assembly to revise the requirements for renewable energy, energy efficiency, and peak demand reduction and to alter funding allocations under the Home Energy Assistance Program.
Title
Addresses renewable energy and energy efficiency
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Amstutz [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Energy and Natural Resources |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Passed |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-12-06 | House | Passed |
2016-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2016-12-06 | House | Passed |
2016-12-01 | House | Reported - Substitute: Public Utilities |
2016-05-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Public Utilities |
2016-05-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 28 | 143 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 643 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 645 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 6610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 6620 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 6621 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 664 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 27 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |