OH HB54 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 158.01, 158.02, 158.03, 158.04, 158.05, 158.06, 158.07, 158.08, 158.09, 158.10, and 158.11 of the Revised Code to authorize the Treasurer of State to issue revenue obligations of the state for the purpose of making loans to qualifying public entities for their acquisition of permanent improvements through the Treasurer of State's purchase of public obligations of those qualifying entities.
Title
Issue state revenue bonds to finance acquisition of improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2017-02-21 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 58 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 58 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |