OH HB537 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2529 of the Revised Code to designate February 12 as "Cholangiocarcinoma Awareness Day."
Title
Designate Cholangiocarcinoma Awareness Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective 9/23/22 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Passed |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Reported: Health |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported: Health |
2022-02-15 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced |