OH HB531 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 122.12 and 122.121 and to enact section 122.122 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 259.30 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly and Section 259.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to remove limitations on the amount of sports events grants that may be awarded in a fiscal year, to adjust the amount that may be awarded for a specific event, to modify eligibility requirements for such grants, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fund and remove limit on sports events grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-05SenatePassed
2018-12-05SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2018-09-25SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2018-06-26SenateIntroduced
2018-06-20HousePassed
2018-05-22HouseReported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-03-06HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12212Amended CodeCitation Text
122121Amended CodeCitation Text
122122New CodeSee Bill Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
573921Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback