OH HB529 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-29)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Effective 6/29/18 - Certain provisions effective 7/01/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-29)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Effective 6/29/18 - Certain provisions effective 7/01/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 164.05 of the Revised Code to make capital appropriations and changes to the law governing capital projects and to make reappropriations for the biennium ending June 30, 2020.
Title
Makes capital appropriations and reappropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Effective 6/29/18 - Certain provisions effective 7/01/18 | |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported: Finance |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported: Finance |
2018-02-27 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 64 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |