OH HB523 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-28 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-28 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.46, 959.99, 2151.421, 4757.10, 4757.13, 4757.18, 4757.22, 4757.23, 4757.32, and 4757.33 and to enact sections 959.07, 959.08, 959.09, 959.10, 2151.4210, 2919.252, and 4757.25 of the Revised Code to establish animal abuse reporting requirements, to require the Department of Defense Family Advocacy Program to be notified when a person serving in the armed forces is investigated for child abuse or neglect or domestic violence, and to modify the laws regulating counselors, social workers, and marriage and family therapists.
Title
Regards social workers and abuse reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-11-15 | House | Passed |
2018-05-29 | House | Reported - Substitute: Community and Family Advancement |
2018-02-27 | House | Refer to Committee: Community and Family Advancement |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture : Animals
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services
Juvenile and Family Law
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Welfare
Military and Veterans
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services
Juvenile and Family Law
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Welfare
Military and Veterans
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 51 | 421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 4210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
29 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 19 | 252 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 57 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 57 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 57 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 57 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 57 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 57 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 57 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 57 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 59 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 59 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 59 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 59 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 59 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |