OH HB523 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-08 - Effective 9/8/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.572, 519.21, 4123.54, 4729.75, 4729.80, 4729.84, 4729.85, 4729.86, 4731.22, 4731.281, 4776.02, 4776.04, and 5713.30 and to enact sections 3796.01, 3796.02, 3796.021, 3796.03, 3796.031, 3796.032, 3796.04, 3796.05, 3796.06, 3796.061, 3796.07, 3796.08, 3796.09, 3796.10, 3796.11, 3796.12, 3796.13, 3796.14, 3796.15, 3796.16, 3796.17, 3796.18, 3796.19, 3796.20, 3796.21, 3796.22, 3796.23, 3796.24, 3796.27, 3796.28, 3796.29, 3796.30, 4729.771, 4731.229, 4731.30, 4731.301, and 4731.302 of the Revised Code to authorize the use of marijuana for medical purposes and to establish the Medical Marijuana Control Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the use of marijuana for medical purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-08 Effective 9/8/16
2016-05-25SenatePassed
2016-05-25HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2016-05-25SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2016-05-11SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2016-05-10SenateIntroduced
2016-05-10HousePassed
2016-05-09HouseReported - Substitute: Select Committee on Medical Marijuana
2016-04-19HouseRefer to Committee: Select Committee on Medical Marijuana
2016-04-14HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
109572Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
303Amended CodeCitation Text
30321Amended CodeCitation Text
37New CodeSee Bill Text
3796New CodeSee Bill Text
379601New CodeSee Bill Text
379602New CodeSee Bill Text
3796021New CodeSee Bill Text
379603New CodeSee Bill Text
3796031New CodeSee Bill Text
3796032New CodeSee Bill Text
379604New CodeSee Bill Text
379605New CodeSee Bill Text
379606New CodeSee Bill Text
3796061New CodeSee Bill Text
379607New CodeSee Bill Text
379608New CodeSee Bill Text
379609New CodeSee Bill Text
379610New CodeSee Bill Text
379611New CodeSee Bill Text
379612New CodeSee Bill Text
379613New CodeSee Bill Text
379614New CodeSee Bill Text
379615New CodeSee Bill Text
379616New CodeSee Bill Text
379617New CodeSee Bill Text
379618New CodeSee Bill Text
379619New CodeSee Bill Text
379620New CodeSee Bill Text
379621New CodeSee Bill Text
379622New CodeSee Bill Text
379623New CodeSee Bill Text
379624New CodeSee Bill Text
379626New CodeSee Bill Text
379627New CodeSee Bill Text
379628New CodeSee Bill Text
379629New CodeSee Bill Text
379630New CodeSee Bill Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
412354Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4729Amended CodeCitation Text
472975Amended CodeCitation Text
4729771New CodeSee Bill Text
472980Amended CodeCitation Text
472981Amended CodeCitation Text
472982Amended CodeCitation Text
472983Amended CodeCitation Text
472984Amended CodeCitation Text
472985Amended CodeCitation Text
472986Amended CodeCitation Text
4731New CodeSee Bill Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text
4731229New CodeSee Bill Text
4731281Amended CodeCitation Text
4731283New CodeSee Bill Text
473130New CodeSee Bill Text
4731301New CodeSee Bill Text
4731302New CodeSee Bill Text
4776Amended CodeCitation Text
477602Amended CodeCitation Text
477604Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
519Amended CodeCitation Text
51921Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5713Amended CodeCitation Text
571330Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback