OH HB519 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 718.05, 718.27, 718.85, and 718.89 of the Revised Code to modify the law regarding extensions for filing municipal income tax returns and to limit penalties for late filings.
Title
Regards extensions for filing municipal income tax returns
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2022-01-25 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-12-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 18 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 18 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 18 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 18 | 89 | Amended Code | Citation Text |