OH HB518 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.01, 1901.02, 1901.021, 1901.027, 1901.03, 1901.08, 1901.181, 1901.31, 1901.311, 1901.34, 1907.11, 2151.23, and 2301.03 of the Revised Code to create the Fulton County Municipal Court in Wauseon on January 1, 2024, to establish one full-time judgeship in that court, to abolish the Fulton County County Court on that date, to provide for the election for the Fulton County Municipal Court of one full-time judge in 2023, to add one full-time judge to the Fairborn Municipal Court, to expand the jurisdiction of the Housing Division of the Toledo Municipal Court, to abolish the East Liverpool Municipal Court in Columbiana County, to expand the jurisdiction of the Portage County Domestic Relations Court, and relative to the Hamilton County Municipal Court.
Title
Create Fulton County Municipal Court; abolish Fulton County Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective 9/23/22 | |
2022-06-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Passed |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2022-01-25 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2021-12-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |