OH HB514 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Reported - Re-referred to Ways and Means: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Reported - Re-referred to Ways and Means: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5703.21, 5747.01, 5747.98, 5751.98, and 6301.04 and to enact sections 3333.126, 3333.611, 3333.612, 5747.82, 5747.83, and 5751.55 of the Revised Code to authorize tax incentives for higher education intern and graduate wages, to make other changes regarding higher education student financial aid, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Regards higher education student financial aid, intern wages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Ways and Means: Rules and Reference |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported - Amended - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Higher Education and Career Readiness |
2022-01-25 | House | Refer to Committee: Higher Education and Career Readiness |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Education : Higher Education
Employment : Workforce Development
Finance and Appropriations
State and Local Government : State Government
Taxation
Employment : Workforce Development
Finance and Appropriations
State and Local Government : State Government
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 33 | 126 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 611 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 612 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 03 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 51 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 51 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |