OH HB513 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-17)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 323.151, 323.152, 323.153, 4503.064, 4503.065, and 4503.066 of the Revised Code to enhance the homestead exemption for surviving spouses of peace officers, firefighters, and emergency medical personnel killed in the line of duty.
Title
Enhance homestead exemption for spouse of killed first responder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-20 | House | Passed |
2018-05-22 | House | Reported: Ways and Means |
2018-02-27 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 23 | 151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | 153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 03 | 064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | 065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | 066 | Amended Code | Citation Text |