OH HB506 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 956.01, 956.02, 956.03, 956.04, 956.05, 956.051, 956.06, 956.07, 956.08, 956.10, 956.11, 956.13, 956.14, 956.18, 956.181, 956.19, 956.20, 956.21, and 956.22; to enact sections 956.031 and 956.041; and to repeal section 956.12 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing high volume dog breeders and other dog-related professionals and facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise law governing high volume dog breeders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Effective 9/28/18
2018-06-20HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-06-06SenatePassed
2018-05-23SenateReported - Substitute: Agriculture
2018-04-11SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture
2018-03-26SenateIntroduced
2018-03-21HousePassed
2018-03-15HouseReported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-02-20HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
956Amended CodeCitation Text
95601Amended CodeCitation Text
95602Amended CodeCitation Text
95603Amended CodeCitation Text
956031New CodeSee Bill Text
95604Amended CodeCitation Text
956041New CodeSee Bill Text
95605Amended CodeCitation Text
956051Amended CodeCitation Text
95606Amended CodeCitation Text
95607Amended CodeCitation Text
95608Amended CodeCitation Text
95610Amended CodeCitation Text
95611Amended CodeCitation Text
95612Repealed CodeCitation Text
95613Amended CodeCitation Text
95614Amended CodeCitation Text
95618Amended CodeCitation Text
956181Amended CodeCitation Text
95619Amended CodeCitation Text
95620Amended CodeCitation Text
95621Amended CodeCitation Text
95622Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback