OH HB505 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1751.04, 1751.72, 3715.01, 3715.64, 3923.041, 4729.01, 4729.38, 4729.99, and 5160.34 and to enact section 3715.011 of the Revised Code to regulate biological products and the substitution of interchangeable biological products, to revise certain deadlines related to prior authorization requirements, to establish an exemption from the laws governing health insuring corporations, to delay the expiration of certain supervision agreements between physicians and physician assistants, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Regulates biological product drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health and Human Services |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-11 | House | Passed |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health and Aging |
2016-04-13 | House | Refer to Committee: Health and Aging |
2016-04-04 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 51 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 72 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 15 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 15 | 011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 15 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 23 | 041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 60 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |